Senate
|
05/14/2025
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2025
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2025
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2025
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2025
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2025
|
Representatives Stroud, Clancy and Madison added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2025
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2025
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2025
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2025
|
Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2025
|
Withdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to calendar of 5-13-2025
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
Representative Penterman added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2025
|
Placed on calendar 3-18-2025 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Representative Miresse added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Representatives Joers and Udell added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2025
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2025
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2025
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Representative Roe added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2025
|
Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Representative Vining added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Representative Sinicki added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Senator Wirch added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Introduced
|
|
|