Senate | 04/21/2025 | Representative J. Jacobson added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Representative Sinicki added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Representative Kitchens added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 03/14/2025 | Introduced |