1 | 1 | | 2025 - 2026 LEGISLATURE |
---|
2 | 2 | | LRB-1527/1 |
---|
3 | 3 | | MRK:emw |
---|
4 | 4 | | 2025 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION 18 |
---|
5 | 5 | | March 14, 2025 - Introduced by Senators CABRAL-GUEVARA and HESSELBEIN, |
---|
6 | 6 | | cosponsored by Representatives FRANKLIN, HURD, DITTRICH, KNODL, |
---|
7 | 7 | | O'CONNOR and PENTERMAN. Referred to Committee on Senate Organization. |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | ***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE*** |
---|
10 | 10 | | Relating to: proclaiming the week of April 14, 2025, as Two Lights for Tomorrow |
---|
11 | 11 | | Week in the state of Wisconsin. |
---|
12 | 12 | | Whereas, the Wisconsin Legislature recognizes the importance of honoring |
---|
13 | 13 | | and commemorating the 250th anniversary of the founding of our nation and |
---|
14 | 14 | | reminding our citizens of the vital significance and relevance of our founding |
---|
15 | 15 | | principles and ideals that created a unique national identity worth fighting for; and |
---|
16 | 16 | | Whereas, the events of 1775 that began the revolution the year before |
---|
17 | 17 | | independence was declared are significant moments that signaled the creation of a |
---|
18 | 18 | | national identity and unity of purpose that transcended traditional geographic, |
---|
19 | 19 | | cultural, and societal divides; and |
---|
20 | 20 | | Whereas, individuals and communities across all the colonies came together |
---|
21 | 21 | | to support their fellow countrymen; and |
---|
22 | 22 | | Whereas, on the evening of April 18, 1775, with impending hostile action from |
---|
23 | 23 | | the British army in Boston, Massachusetts, Paul Revere and William Dawes along |
---|
24 | 24 | | 1 |
---|
25 | 25 | | 2 |
---|
26 | 26 | | 3 |
---|
27 | 27 | | 4 |
---|
28 | 28 | | 5 |
---|
29 | 29 | | 6 |
---|
30 | 30 | | 7 |
---|
31 | 31 | | 8 |
---|
32 | 32 | | 9 |
---|
33 | 33 | | 10 |
---|
34 | 34 | | 11 |
---|
35 | 35 | | 12 |
---|
36 | 36 | | 13 |
---|
37 | 37 | | 14 2025 - 2026 Legislature - 2 - LRB-1527/1 |
---|
38 | 38 | | MRK:emw |
---|
39 | 39 | | with other alarm riders undertook a perilous ride to alert everyone in the |
---|
40 | 40 | | countryside of the coming danger; and |
---|
41 | 41 | | Whereas, preceding their departure from Boston, a prearranged signal was |
---|
42 | 42 | | set in the Old North Church steeple to ensure that the message got out and did not |
---|
43 | 43 | | solely rely on just one or two alarm riders; and |
---|
44 | 44 | | Whereas, the two lanterns that were the signal were immortalized in Henry |
---|
45 | 45 | | Wadsworth Longfellow[s poem Paul Revere[s Ride as Xone if by land, and two if by |
---|
46 | 46 | | seaY and have become an enduring symbol of American vigilance, perseverance, |
---|
47 | 47 | | and preparedness in the face of adversity; and |
---|
48 | 48 | | Whereas, those alarm riders and the citizens that answered the call to arms to |
---|
49 | 49 | | serve and defend their fellow countrymen that night and the following day at the |
---|
50 | 50 | | Battles of Lexington and Concord exemplify the spirit of community and shared |
---|
51 | 51 | | responsibility that has defined our nation since its inception; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | Whereas, we are reminded, 250 years later, that the call for unity and the call |
---|
53 | 53 | | to serve each other is no less relevant today than it was then; and |
---|
54 | 54 | | Whereas, a national initiative has been proposed by the staff of the Wisconsin |
---|
55 | 55 | | Commission for the United States Semiquincentennial Commission that two lights |
---|
56 | 56 | | be displayed in public spaces across the country for all to see, marking that |
---|
57 | 57 | | significant anniversary in April 2025 and the beginning of the 250th anniversary |
---|
58 | 58 | | commemorations leading up to the 250th anniversary of the Declaration of |
---|
59 | 59 | | Independence on July 4, 2026; and |
---|
60 | 60 | | Whereas, state commissions, state governments, federal agencies, and |
---|
61 | 61 | | community, heritage, and historical organizations across the country have eagerly |
---|
62 | 62 | | 1 |
---|
63 | 63 | | 2 |
---|
64 | 64 | | 3 |
---|
65 | 65 | | 4 |
---|
66 | 66 | | 5 |
---|
67 | 67 | | 6 |
---|
68 | 68 | | 7 |
---|
69 | 69 | | 8 |
---|
70 | 70 | | 9 |
---|
71 | 71 | | 10 |
---|
72 | 72 | | 11 |
---|
73 | 73 | | 12 |
---|
74 | 74 | | 13 |
---|
75 | 75 | | 14 |
---|
76 | 76 | | 15 |
---|
77 | 77 | | 16 |
---|
78 | 78 | | 17 |
---|
79 | 79 | | 18 |
---|
80 | 80 | | 19 |
---|
81 | 81 | | 20 |
---|
82 | 82 | | 21 |
---|
83 | 83 | | 22 |
---|
84 | 84 | | 23 2025 - 2026 Legislature - 3 - LRB-1527/1 |
---|
85 | 85 | | MRK:emw |
---|
86 | 86 | | endorsed the initiative, have pledged to support it and participate in it, and have |
---|
87 | 87 | | encouraged others to do the same; and |
---|
88 | 88 | | Whereas, some participating entities have also pledged to encourage a day of |
---|
89 | 89 | | community service on April 19, 2025, as a way to encourage understanding about |
---|
90 | 90 | | the true meaning of these historical commemorations, knowing that these events |
---|
91 | 91 | | are not just marking history for history[s sake but rather encouraging reflection on |
---|
92 | 92 | | the idea that all of these historic events were endeavoring toward one common goal: |
---|
93 | 93 | | the chance for a better tomorrow, together; now, therefore, be it |
---|
94 | 94 | | Resolved by the senate, the assembly concurring, That the members of |
---|
95 | 95 | | the Wisconsin Legislature do hereby proclaim the week of April 14, 2025, as Two |
---|
96 | 96 | | Lights for Tomorrow Week and call on all citizens to unite in remembrance of our |
---|
97 | 97 | | shared history, honoring the sacrifices made by those who fought for our |
---|
98 | 98 | | independence and reminding ourselves of the values we hold dear today; and, be it |
---|
99 | 99 | | further |
---|
100 | 100 | | Resolved, That the Wisconsin Legislature encourages all government |
---|
101 | 101 | | buildings, community centers, public spaces, and citizens to take part in this |
---|
102 | 102 | | symbolic display by prominently displaying two lights for all to see during the week |
---|
103 | 103 | | of April 14, 2025, and to reflect on how those lights shining out in the darkness |
---|
104 | 104 | | during this vigil symbolically illustrate our ongoing journey as a nation. |
---|
105 | 105 | | (END) |
---|
106 | 106 | | 1 |
---|
107 | 107 | | 2 |
---|
108 | 108 | | 3 |
---|
109 | 109 | | 4 |
---|
110 | 110 | | 5 |
---|
111 | 111 | | 6 |
---|
112 | 112 | | 7 |
---|
113 | 113 | | 8 |
---|
114 | 114 | | 9 |
---|
115 | 115 | | 10 |
---|
116 | 116 | | 11 |
---|
117 | 117 | | 12 |
---|
118 | 118 | | 13 |
---|
119 | 119 | | 14 |
---|
120 | 120 | | 15 |
---|
121 | 121 | | 16 |
---|
122 | 122 | | 17 |
---|
123 | 123 | | 18 |
---|
124 | 124 | | 19 |
---|
125 | 125 | | 20 |
---|