Wisconsin 2025-2026 Regular Session

Wisconsin Senate Bill SJR49 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/09/2025

                            2025 - 2026  LEGISLATURE
LRB-2984/1
RJL:skw
2025 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION 49
May 9, 2025 - Introduced by Senators TOMCZYK, TESTIN, HABUSH SINYKIN, JACQUE, 
LARSON, PFAFF, RATCLIFF, SPREITZER, WALL, WIMBERGER and WIRCH, 
cosponsored by Representatives SNYDER, KRUG, BARE, BROWN, DONOVAN, 
EMERSON, HONG, JOHNSON, KAUFERT, KITCHENS, KNODL, MCCARVILLE, 
MELOTIK, MIRESSE, MOSES, NEUBAUER, O'CONNOR, PALMERI, RIVERA-
WAGNER, ROE, SHEEHAN, SINICKI, SNODGRASS, TENORIO, TRANEL, WICHGERS, 
WITTKE and SUBECK. Referred to Committee on Senate Organization. 
 
 ***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE***
Relating to: commemorating Hmong-Lao Veterans Day and honoring the Hmong-
Lao veterans who served alongside the United States in the Vietnam War.
Whereas, during the Vietnam War, the Central Intelligence Agency and U.S. 
Armed Forces recruited, organized, trained, and assisted Hmong-Lao forces to 
combat the North Vietnamese Army and Pathet Lao forces; and
Whereas, thousands of Hmong-Lao people courageously fought alongside 
Americans throughout the Vietnam War and, facing harsh retribution from the 
Vietnamese and Lao governments following the war[s end, many were ultimately 
forced to flee their homes; and
Whereas, on May 14, 1975, the last of the Hmong-Lao soldiers and their 
families fled Laos for the Nam Phong refugee camp in Thailand to later resettle in 
communities throughout the United States, including Wisconsin, and today, our 
state is home to a significant number of Hmong-Lao veterans; and
Whereas, in accordance with 2021 Wisconsin Act 31, May 14 of each year is 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14 2025 - 2026  Legislature - 2 -	LRB-2984/1
RJL:skw
designated as a day to thank Hmong-Lao veterans in Wisconsin for their service 
and sacrifice, recall the accomplishments of Hmong-Lao veterans, and encourage 
schools to include the military service of Hmong-Lao veterans in discussions and 
curriculums about the Vietnam War; and
Whereas, the Wisconsin Lao Veterans of America (WLVA) has established 
chapters throughout our state to serve local communities and educate the public 
about the contributions of our Hmong-Lao veterans during the Vietnam War; and
Whereas, today, the state of Wisconsin joins the WLVA and all Wisconsinites 
in reflecting on the tremendous, and too often overlooked, heroism and sacrifice of 
Hmong-Lao veterans in our state; now, therefore, be it
Resolved by the senate, the assembly concurring, That the members of 
the Wisconsin Legislature recognize May 14, 2025, and May 14, 2026, as Hmong-
Lao Veterans Day and pay tribute to those Hmong-Lao veterans who honorably and 
bravely served alongside the United States in the Vietnam War.
(END)
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15