02/28/2025 | Assigned Chapter Number 65 | |||
02/28/2025 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0032 | |||
House | 02/25/2025 | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0032 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | President Signed SEA No. 0032 | ||
02/25/2025 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0032 | |||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Recede from Non-Concurrence : 28-3-0-0-0 | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Appointed JCC01 Members | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Concur:Failed 6-25-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Received for Concurrence | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-2-0-0 | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | 2nd Reading:Passed | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | COW:Passed | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
Senate | 01/22/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-1-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/16/2025 | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation | ||
12/09/2024 | Bill Number Assigned |