House | 02/28/2025 | COW:H Did not consider for COW | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-3-0-0-0 | ||
House | 01/31/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | 2nd Reading:Passed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | COW:Passed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor | ||
12/31/2024 | Bill Number Assigned |