Senate | 02/10/2025 | COW:Failed 10-20-1-0-0 | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Placed on General File | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Received for Introduction | ||
01/16/2025 | Bill Number Assigned |