Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Placed on local & uncontested calendar
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Left pending in committee