Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to s/c on Workforce by Speaker: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report distributed: Apr 25 2025 10:10AM
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 03/26/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Mar 26 2025 11:26AM
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 03/31/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Mar 31 2025 3:00PM