All Bills - Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR351
Introduced
4/24/25
Refer
4/24/25
Expressing support for the recognition of April as "National Arab American Heritage Month" (NAAHM) and celebrating the heritage and culture of Arab Americans in the United States.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR352
Introduced
4/24/25
Refer
4/24/25
Calling on elected officials and civil society leaders to counter antisemitism and educate the public on the contributions of the Jewish American community.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR353
Introduced
4/28/25
Refer
4/28/25
Impeaching Donald John Trump, President of the United States, for high crimes and misdemeanors.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR354
Introduced
4/28/25
Providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 60) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the National Park Service relating to "Glen Canyon National Recreation Area: Motor Vehicles"; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 78) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the United States Fish and Wildlife Service relating to "Endangered and Threatened Wildlife and Plants; Endangered Species Status for the San Francisco Bay-Delta Distinct Population Segment of the Longfin Smelt"; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 87) providing congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "California State Motor Vehicle and Engine Pollution Control Standards; Heavy-Duty Vehicle and Engine Emission Warranty and Maintenance Provisions; Advanced Clean Trucks; Zero Emission Airport Shuttle; Zero-Emission Power Train Certification; Waiver of Preemption; Notice of Decision"; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 88) providing congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "California State Motor Vehicle and Engine Pollution Control Standards; Advanced Clean Cars II; Waiver of Preemption; Notice of Decision"; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 89) providing congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Environmental Protection Agency relating to "California State Motor Vehicle and Engine and Nonroad Engine Pollution Control Standards; The 'Omnibus' Low NOX Regulation; Waiver of Preemption; Notice of Decision"; and for other purposes.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR355
Introduced
4/28/25
Refer
4/28/25
Supporting the designation of the week of April 28 through May 2, 2025, as "National Specialized Instructional Support Personnel Appreciation Week".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR356
Introduced
4/28/25
Refer
4/28/25
Expressing support for the designation of April 13, 2025, through April 26, 2025, as "National Young Audiences Arts for Learning Week".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR357
Introduced
4/29/25
Refer
4/29/25
Of inquiry requesting the President and directing the Secretary of State to transmit to the House of Representatives any record created on or after January 20, 2025, under the control of the President or the Secretary, respectively, relating to international agreements between the United States of America and El Salvador and the removal of individuals from the United States to El Salvador and subsequent detentions of such individuals.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR358
Introduced
4/29/25
Refer
4/29/25
A resolution seeking justice for the Japanese citizens abducted by North Korea.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR359
Introduced
4/29/25
Refer
4/29/25
Supporting the mission and goals of National Fentanyl Awareness Day in 2025, including increasing individual and public awareness of the impact of fake or counterfeit fentanyl pills on families and young people.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR36
Introduced
1/13/25
Refer
1/13/25
<p><strong>Finding Federal Savings Committee Resolution</strong></p> <p>This resolution establishes the House Committee on the Elimination of Nonessential Federal Programs to analyze underperforming or nonessential federal programs and recommend actions to modify or eliminate those programs. The resolution also establishes expedited procedures for legislation reported by the committee to eliminate programs or rescind funding.</p> <p>The committee shall cease to exist at the end of the 120th Congress.</p>
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR360
Introduced
4/29/25
Refer
4/29/25
Expressing support for the designation of the last Tuesday of April each year as "APOL1-Mediated Kidney Disease (AMKD) Awareness Day".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR361
Introduced
4/30/25
Refer
4/30/25
Supporting the recognition of April 4, 2025, as the International Day for Mine Awareness and Assistance in Mine Action, and reaffirming the leadership of the United States in eliminating landmines and unexploded ordnance.
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR362
Introduced
4/30/25
Refer
4/30/25
Expressing support for the designation of April 30, 2025, as "National Adult Hepatitis B Vaccination Awareness Day".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR363
Introduced
4/30/25
Refer
4/30/25
Expressing support for the designation of the week of May 9 through May 18, 2025, as "National American Birding Week".
US
Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session
Us Congress House Bill HR364
Introduced
4/30/25
Refer
4/30/25
Calling upon local communities to support organizations that provide resources and aid Gold Shield Families in their time of need.