House
|
06/13/2024
|
MANIFEST ERROR(S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y38 N1 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
TITLE CHANGE: SCR 22
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCUR TAKEN UP
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCUR READ AND HELD
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
VERSION: SCS CSHB 251(L&C) AM S
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
PASSED Y20 N-
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 251(L&C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
L&C SCS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
FN2: ZERO(DNR)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(DEC)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
NR: DUNBAR
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
DP: BJORKMAN, GRAY-JACKSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
TITLE CHANGE: SCR 22
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2024
|
L&C RPT SCS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): MYERS, HUGHES, BJORKMAN, SHOWER
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
L&C
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
VERSION: CSHB 251(L&C) AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): VANCE, TOMASZEWSKI, JOSEPHSON
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
PASSED Y40
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 251(L&C) AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING SAME DAY Y40
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
AM NO 8 FAILED Y2 N38
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
AM NO 7 NOT OFFERED
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
AM NO 6 FAILED Y1 N39
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
AM NO 5 FAILED Y1 N37 A2
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
AM NO 4 FAILED Y1 N38 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
AM NO 3 FAILED Y2 N37 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N30 A1
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
L&C CS ADOPTED Y37 N1 A2
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): MEARS
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(DEC)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
DP: MEARS, ARMSTRONG, DIBERT, MCCABE, SADDLER, WRIGHT, BAKER, RAUSCHER, MCKAY
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
RES RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 9DP
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(DEC)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
NR: CARRICK, FIELDS, SADDLER, PRAX, WRIGHT
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
DP: RUFFRIDGE, SUMNER
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
L&C RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 2DP 5NR
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): WRIGHT
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
L&C, RES
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
PREFILE RELEASED 1/12/24
|
|
|