Alaska 2023-2024 Regular Session

Alaska House Bill HB251 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2024
Bill May 11, 2024
Bill May 6, 2024
Bill March 28, 2024