Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
L&C, HSS
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
VERSION: HB 285
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG, ALLARD, SCHRAGE, STUTES, SADDLER
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
PASSED Y37 N1 E2
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME HB 285
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
COSPONSOR(S): STORY, GALVIN, JOSEPHSON
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/26 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
AM NO 1 FAILED Y1 N37 E2
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 4/24/2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
FIN REFERRAL REMOVED
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(CED)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
NR: PRAX
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
DP: FIELDS, SUMNER, RUFFRIDGE, MCCORMICK, MINA
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
HSS RPT 5DP 1NR
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
FN1: ZERO(CED)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
NR: RUFFRIDGE, WRIGHT, PRAX, SADDLER
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
DP: FIELDS, CARRICK, SUMNER
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
L&C RPT 3DP 4NR
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
HSS REFERRAL MOVED TO AFTER L&C
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
L&C REFERRAL ADDED AFTER HSS
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
HSS, FIN
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|