Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/31/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 8/30 CH 46 SLA 24
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
1:45 P.M. 8/7/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
|
|
|
House
|
09/03/2024
|
FN1: (ADM) FROM SB 208
|
|
|
House
|
09/03/2024
|
FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 268
|
|
|
House
|
09/03/2024
|
LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/30/24
|
|
|
House
|
09/03/2024
|
FN4: (ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
MANIFEST ERROR(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
VERSION: HCS CSSB 95(RLS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, MINA
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
PASSED Y39 N1
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 95(RLS)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
RLS HCS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
DP: FIELDS, SUMNER, SHAW, ALLARD, TILTON, C.JOHNSON
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
TITLE CHANGE: HCR 19
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
RLS RPT HCS(RLS) NEW TITLE 6DP
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
HELD TO 5/14 CALENDAR
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING RLS RPT/REF
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
FN3: (ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
NR: HANNAN
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
DP: TOMASZEWSKI, CRONK, ORTIZ, COULOMBE, JOSEPHSON, GALVIN, STAPP, FOSTER
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
PENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
FIN RPT HCS(STA) NEW TITLE 8DP 1NR
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
FN2: (ADM)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
NR: CARPENTER, C.JOHNSON, ALLARD, CARRICK
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
DP: WRIGHT, STORY, SHAW
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
PENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
STA RPT HCS(STA) NEW TITLE 3DP 4NR
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
STA, FIN
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
VERSION: CSSB 95(STA) AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
TRANSMITTED TO (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
PASSED Y18 N1 A1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN, DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON, KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, SHOWER
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 95(STA)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CAL
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
STA CS ADOPTED UC
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
READ THE SECOND TIME
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
FN1: (ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
NR: OLSON
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, WILSON, KIEHL, MERRICK, BISHOP
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
FIN RPT CS(STA) 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
FN1: (ADM)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
DP: KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, CLAMAN, MERRICK, BJORKMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
STA RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): BJORKMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
COSPONSOR(S): KIEHL
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
STA, FIN
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
|
|
|