Alaska 2023-2024 Regular Session

Alaska Senate Bill SB95 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2024
Bill March 14, 2024
Bill May 16, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023