House | 03/29/2022 | Delivered to Governor at 3:35 p.m. on March 29, 2022. | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-201. | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Clerk of the House Certification | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Simpson motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 726 | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Concurrence Requested | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 679 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Givhan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 678 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Givhan Amendment Offered | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/09/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 106 | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |