House | 03/17/2022 | Delivered to Governor at 1:49 p.m. on March 17, 2022. | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Assigned Act No. 2022-169. | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Clerk of the House Certification | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Enrolled | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Signature Requested | ||
House | 03/17/2022 | Passed Second House | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 628 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Third Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Grimsley intended to vote "Yea" | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 39 | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |