Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Assigned Act No. 2022-254.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Conference Committee on SB108 2022RS first Substitute Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Concurred in Conference Report
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 769
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Conference Report Concurrence Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Albritton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 759
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Conference Report
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Conference Committee Appointed
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Clouse motion to Accede adopted Voice Vote 648 House appoints Clouse, South and Hall
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2022
|
Conference Committee Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Reed motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 581 P&PO appoints Albritton, Livingston and Smitherman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Concurrence Requested
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Chestnut intended to vote "Yea"
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 604
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 603
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Third Reading Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 434
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Albritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 433
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
|
|
|