Senate | 04/11/2024 | Reported Out of Committee Second House | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Pending Senate Children and Youth Health | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Children and Youth Health | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Engrossed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 377 | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 376 8DTV2HF-1 | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Paramore 1st Amendment Offered 8DTV2HF-1 | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 375 XCPDEZ7-1 | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Children and Senior Advocacy Engrossed Substitute Offered XCPDEZ7-1 | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading in House of Origin | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted XCPDEZ7-1 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Committee Amendment Adopted 94CLBPP-1 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Committee Amendment Adopted PDZLEGE-1 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Pending House Children and Senior Advocacy | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Children and Senior Advocacy | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Prefiled |