House
|
04/24/2024
|
Enacted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 379
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Livingston motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 378 IDU2WWZ-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Judiciary 1st Amendment Offered IDU2WWZ-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee Second House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Judiciary 1st Amendment IDU2WWZ-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Pending Senate Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 163
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 162 25GWSSK-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
JUDY Reported Substitute Offered from House Judiciary 25GWSSK-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted 25GWSSK-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Committee Amendment Adopted TVUY995-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Committee Amendment Adopted W42KE9E-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Committee Amendment Adopted CUIKJJJ-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Committee Amendment Adopted VEYMPLL-1
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Pending House Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|