House | 05/07/2024 | Currently Indefinitely Postponed | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Carried Over to the Call of the Chair | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin from House Health 5SUKMM3-1 | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Health 1st Amendment 1P8NLLZ-1 | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Pending House Health | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Health |