Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Enacted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Signature Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Ready to Enroll
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Reed Concur In and Adopt House Amendment - Adopted Roll Call 1020
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 1073
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1072 IE1XWZZ-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Reynolds 1st Amendment Offered IE1XWZZ-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1071 66CP1ZZ-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Ways and Means General Fund 1st Substitute Offered 66CP1ZZ-1
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Third Reading in Second House
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee Second House
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
Ways and Means General Fund 1st Substitute 66CP1ZZ-1
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Pending House Ways and Means General Fund
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 481
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Livingston motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 480 NM6UJ88-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Livingston 1st Amendment Offered NM6UJ88-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Albritton motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 479 41WAIRR-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Albritton 2nd Substitute Offered 41WAIRR-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Albritton motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote F3XSC5C-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Finance and Taxation General Fund 1st Substitute Offered F3XSC5C-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Third Reading in House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Finance and Taxation General Fund 1st Substitute F3XSC5C-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Pending Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
|
|
|