House | 02/23/2022 | Notification that HB1046 is now Act 61 | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | TO BE ENROLLED | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Returned to the House as Passed. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Read the third time and passed. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Received from the House. | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Returned by the Committee Do Pass | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Filed |