Senate | 05/01/2023 | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Motion to expunge the vote by which HB1324 failed. Motion Carried. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read the third time and failed. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Received from the House. | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Returned by the Committee Do Pass | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Filed |