Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|