Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2116 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 18, 2022
Analysis March 15, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022