House
|
03/29/2022
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
House GE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Assigned to House GE Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|