Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1182 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis March 21, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022