Senate | 07/31/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 07/31/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-18-3-0) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House consent calendar | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-4-0-1-0-0) | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-3-0-0-0) | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Assigned to House LARA Committee | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time |