Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2518 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 28, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023
Analysis February 2, 2023