Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2554 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 10, 2023