Senate | 07/31/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 07/31/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House minority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House majority caucus: Do pass | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House MOE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Assigned to House MOE Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time |