House
|
05/09/2023
|
House miscellaneous motion: Representative Martinez made a motion to further extend the reconsideration period for SB1047.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House miscellaneous motion: Representative Biasiucci made a motion to extend the reconsideration period for SB1047 for an additional 14 days. Passed by v/v.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
House motion to reconsider third reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
House third reading FAILED voting: (24-34-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House consent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-7-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned to House MAPS Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Senate MAPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|