Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1047 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023