Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1177 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis January 31, 2023