Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1253 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 27, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023