Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1323 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis February 7, 2023