House | 03/23/2023 | House RA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0-0-0) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Assigned to House RA Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |