Arizona 2023 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1418 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023