House | 03/20/2024 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-7-1-0-0-0) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | House read second time | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Introduced in House and read first time | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-2-0) | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |