Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1188 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 18, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024