|
06/18/2024
|
Governor Vetoed
|
|
|
|
06/13/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (34-26-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Transmit to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
House refer to additional Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Biasiucci that the House rescind its action whereby on Third Reading of Bills it passed Senate Bill 1435..
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate miscellaneous motion: At the request of the House, Senate Bill 1435 was returned to the House of Representatives for the purpose of reconsideration.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Motion by Representative Biasiucci that the House request the Senate to return SB1435 for the purpose of reconsideration.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House third reading PASSED voting: (37-21-2-0)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Biasiucci that the House suspend Rule 32, and notwithstanding any other House Rule that SB1435 be placed under the order of business for Third Reading of bills today. Passed by vv.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
House majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
House read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Assigned to House RULES Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Assigned to House JUD Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Introduced in House and read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Transmit to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-9-2-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senate minority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senate majority caucus: Do pass
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Senate read second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Assigned to Senate JUD Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Introduced in Senate and read first time
|
|
|