Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SB1435 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill March 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis August 7, 2024
Analysis June 26, 2024
Analysis June 14, 2024
Analysis June 6, 2024
Analysis April 30, 2024
Analysis April 8, 2024
Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis March 19, 2024
Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024