03/20/2024 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Transmit to Senate | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Transmit to House | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Senate additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate consent calendar | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Senate read second time | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |