Arizona 2024 Regular Session

Arizona Senate Bill SCR1021 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024