|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3357.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
From inactive file. To unfinished business file.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Hayashi.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1842.)
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. In committee: Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2018.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1819.).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/16/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
|
|
|
|
01/15/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|