LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB120
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB120
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB120
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 15, 2009
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 21, 2009
Compare
Amended
Bill
July 8, 2009
Compare
Bill
June 22, 2009
Compare
Bill
June 1, 2009
Compare
Bill
May 18, 2009
Compare
Bill
May 7, 2009
Compare
Bill
April 13, 2009
Compare
Bill
March 26, 2009
Compare