LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB120
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB120
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB120
Compare Versions
AB120 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB120 Amended July 8, 2009
AB120 Amended June 22, 2009
AB120 Amended June 1, 2009
AB120 Amended May 18, 2009
AB120 Amended May 7, 2009
AB120 Amended April 13, 2009
AB120 Amended March 26, 2009
AB120 Introduced January 15, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB120 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB120 Amended July 8, 2009
AB120 Amended June 22, 2009
AB120 Amended June 1, 2009
AB120 Amended May 18, 2009
AB120 Amended May 7, 2009
AB120 Amended April 13, 2009
AB120 Amended March 26, 2009
AB120 Introduced January 15, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare