|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 147, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2546.)
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 1760.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar. To third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1603.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|