California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1361 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill July 17, 2009

Chaptered

Bill August 6, 2009

Amended

Bill July 9, 2009
Bill June 30, 2009
Bill June 23, 2009
Bill May 13, 2009
Bill May 4, 2009
Bill April 20, 2009
Bill April 14, 2009